NJ S106 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A748
Note: Carry Foward to future S379
Note: Carry Over of previous S1045
Note: Carry Foward to future S379
Note: Carry Over of previous S1045
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes various changes to law addressing meetings of public bodies to provide public with greater access to meetings and information about meetings.
Title
Makes various changes to law addressing meetings of public bodies to provide public with greater access to meetings and information about meetings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-17 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-17 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S106 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S106 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1045 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading without recommendation
A1019 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S106 (Carry Over) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1045 (Carry Over) 2017-06-29 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading without recommendation
A1019 (Same As) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee