NJ AR89 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-22 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Encourages increased recycling to protect environment and reduce solid waste disposal costs; supports Wyckoff's "Nifty-Fifty" initiative.
Title
Encourages increased recycling to protect environment and reduce solid waste disposal costs; supports Wyckoff's "Nifty-Fifty" initiative.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 80 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-22 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2010-06-21 | Passed by the Assembly (80-0-0) | |
2010-06-14 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-06-10 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/AR89 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/AR/89_I1.HTM |
Roll Call | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bills/BillView.asp?BillNumber=AR89 |