NJ AR81 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AR42
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Passed by the Assembly (66-1-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 1 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Passed by the Assembly (66-1-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress to pass "Community Parks Revitalization Act."
Title
Urges Congress to pass "Community Parks Revitalization Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 66 N: 1 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-29 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (66-1-3) |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AR42 (Carry Over) 2019-03-11 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading