NJ AR219 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on March 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-25 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Encourages DOH to develop set of standards for respectful care at birth and to conduct public outreach initiative.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Encourages DOH to develop set of standards for respectful care at birth and to conduct public outreach initiative.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-25AssemblyFiled with Secretary of State
2019-03-25AssemblyResolution Passed Assembly (78-0-0)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-03-18AssemblyRecommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee
2019-01-24AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2019-01-24AssemblyReported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee
2019-01-17AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee

Same As/Similar To

SR121 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
SR121 (Same As) 2019-03-04 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback