NJ AR139 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on May 26 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-26 - Filed with Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commemorates appointment of Justice Ketanji Brown Jackson as Associate Justice of United States Supreme Court.
Title
Commemorates appointment of Justice Ketanji Brown Jackson as Associate Justice of United States Supreme Court.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-05-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 63 N: 1 NV: 16 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-05-19 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Filed with Secretary of State |
2022-05-26 | Assembly | Resolution Passed Assembly (63-1-2) |
2022-05-19 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-05-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
2022-05-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |