NJ AJR69 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR33
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR50
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR50
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 18 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates March 31 of each year as "Cesar Chavez Day."
Title
Designates March 31 of each year as "Cesar Chavez Day."
Sponsors
Rep. Eliana Marin [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Rep. Garnet Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 59 N: 17 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-11 - Assembly - Assembly Labor Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
2024-03-18 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (59-17-0) |
2024-03-11 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR33 (Carry Over) 2022-05-12 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
SJR50 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee
SJR50 (Carry Over) 2022-02-10 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee