NJ AJR63 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR143
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-02-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2025 - 50% progression
Action: 2025-02-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Pending: Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates January 13 of each year as Korean American Day in New Jersey.
Title
Designates January 13 of each year as Korean American Day in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Rep. Ellen Park [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Gabriel Rodriguez [D] |
Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Carmen Morales [D] |
Roll Calls
2025-01-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2025-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2025-02-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2025-01-30 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-0-0) |
2025-01-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR143 (Carry Over) 2022-03-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee