NJ AJR30 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session

Note: Carry Foward to future AJR15
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR67
Note: Carry Over of previous AJR115
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR69

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-3)
Status: Engrossed on February 24 2020 - 50% progression
Action: 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-02-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2020-02-24AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2020-02-13AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2020-01-14AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

AJR30 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR30 (Carry Over) 2020-02-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
AJR115 (Carry Over) 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR36 (Same As) 2020-02-03 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
SJR69 (Carry Over) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback