NJ AJR115 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes the "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes the "New Jersey Domestic Violence and Legal Access Task Force."

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-23 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-05-23AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (77-0-0)
2019-03-18AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-04-12AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR69 (Same As) 2018-04-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback