NJ AJR26 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Approved P.L.2012, JR-5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Passed on November 19 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-11-19 - Approved P.L.2012, JR-5
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates May each year as Asian Pacific American Heritage Month.
Title
Designates May each year as Asian Pacific American Heritage Month.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Sjr54 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-10-04 - Senate - Senate Substitute For Sjr54 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-11-19 | Senate | Approved P.L.2012, JR-5 |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2012-10-04 | Senate | Substituted for SJR54 |
2012-08-20 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-06-25 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee |
2012-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2012-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR54 (Same As) 2012-10-04 - Substituted by AJR26