NJ AJR224 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by SJR123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-06-30 - Substituted by SJR123
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Honors accomplishments of State Troopers Fraternal Association.
Title
Honors accomplishments of State Troopers Fraternal Association.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-06-05 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR123 |
2023-06-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-03-20 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR123 (Same As) 2023-10-03 - Approved P.L.2023, JR-15.