NJ AJR180 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SJR67
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by SJR93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on July 23 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by SJR93
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February 14 of each year as Frederick Douglass Day in NJ.
Title
Designates February 14 of each year as Frederick Douglass Day in NJ.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-24 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR93 |
2020-08-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-07-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Community Development and Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR180 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by SJR93
SJR93 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-3.
SJR93 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-3.