NJ SJR93 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Approved P.L.2021, JR-3.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Designates February 14 of each year as Frederick Douglass Day in NJ.
Title
Designates February 14 of each year as Frederick Douglass Day in NJ.
Sponsors
Sen. Joseph Lagana [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] | Sen. Nellie Pou [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] |
Sen. Richard Codey [D] | Sen. Thomas Kean [R] | Sen. Teresa Ruiz [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-01 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR180 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-28 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-08-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-19 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, JR-3. |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (70-0-0) |
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted for AJR180 |
2021-01-29 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-28 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (32-0) |
2020-08-25 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-08-20 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
AJR180 (Same As) 2021-03-01 - Substituted by SJR93