NJ AJR171 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Approved P.L.2023, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-03-13 - Approved P.L.2023, JR-2.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Permanently designates first full week in April as "Week of the Young Child" in New Jersey.
Title
Permanently designates first full week in April as "Week of the Young Child" in New Jersey.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR79 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-02 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for SJR79 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-26 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-23 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-13 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, JR-2. |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2023-02-02 | Senate | Substituted for SJR79 (1R) |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-01-26 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2023-01-23 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2022-06-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR79 (Same As) 2023-02-02 - Substituted by AJR171 (1R)