NJ AJR132 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR73 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 4 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-27 - Substituted by SJR73 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."
Title
Urges U.S. Congress to pass "Military Hunger Prevention Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-10 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-27 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR73 (1R) |
2019-06-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-06-04 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
SJR73 (Same As) 2019-08-23 - Approved P.L.2019, JR-21.