NJ AJR122 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous SJR76
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by SJR14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-06-30 - Substituted by SJR14
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Designates September 20th of each year as Hispanic Journalist Pride Day.
Title
Designates September 20th of each year as Hispanic Journalist Pride Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-30 | Assembly | Substituted by SJR14 |
2018-05-17 | Assembly | Introduced, 1st Reading without Reference, 2nd Reading |
Same As/Similar To
SJR14 (Same As) 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-8.
SJR76 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
SJR76 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2018/AJR122 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2018/AJR/122_I1.HTM |