NJ SJR14 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous SJR76

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on August 24 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-08-24 - Approved P.L.2018, JR-8.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Designates September 20th of each year as Hispanic Journalist Pride Day.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Designates September 20th of each year as Hispanic Journalist Pride Day.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for AJR122 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-30 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-14 - Senate - Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-08-24AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, JR-8.
2018-06-30AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (74-0-0)
2018-06-30AssemblySubstituted for AJR122
2018-06-21AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2018-06-21SenatePassed by the Senate (40-0)
2018-05-14SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee

Same As/Similar To

SJR76 (Carry Over) 2016-09-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
AJR122 (Same As) 2018-06-30 - Substituted by SJR14

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback