NJ ACR130 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future SCR95
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR209
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR142
Note: Carry Over of previous ACR209
Note: Carry Over of previous SCR142
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
Pending: Assembly Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Urges Congress and President of US to enact legislation addressing interstate transportation of firearms or ammunition.
Title
Urges Congress and President of US to enact legislation addressing interstate transportation of firearms or ammunition.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
ACR130 (Carry Over) 2022-03-17 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
ACR209 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR142 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR69 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
ACR209 (Carry Over) 2021-03-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR142 (Carry Over) 2021-03-04 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
SCR69 (Same As) 2022-02-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/ACR130 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/ACR/130_I1.HTM |