NJ A998 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A1111
Note: Carry Over of previous S2136
Note: Carry Over of previous S2136
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.434.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.434.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
The "New Jersey Social Innovation Act"; establishes social innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Title
The "New Jersey Social Innovation Act"; establishes social innovation loan pilot program and study commission within EDA.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4312 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-15 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 76 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Substitution (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2021, c.434. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (76-0-2) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-1) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4312 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Senate Amendment (29-0) (Ruiz) |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-15 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Economic Growth Committee |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (76-0-0) |
2021-05-18 | Assembly | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1111 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S1534 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Combined with S3144 (SCS)
S4312 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A998/2349 (ACS/1R)
S2136 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1534 (Same As) 2021-06-15 - Combined with S3144 (SCS)
S4312 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A998/2349 (ACS/1R)
S2136 (Carry Over) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee