NJ A1111 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A998
Note: Carry Foward to future S1534
Note: Carry Over of previous A4379
Note: Carry Foward to future S1534
Note: Carry Over of previous A4379
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes social innovation loan guarantee pilot program and study commission within New Jersey Health Care Facilities Financing Authority concerning opioid and other substance use disorders.
Title
Establishes social innovation loan guarantee pilot program and study commission within New Jersey Health Care Facilities Financing Authority concerning opioid and other substance use disorders.
Sponsors
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Eric Houghtaling [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-10-15 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1111 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A1111 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4379 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2136 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A1111 (Carry Over) 2018-10-18 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A4379 (Carry Over) 2016-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S2136 (Same As) 2018-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee