NJ A986 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5208
Note: Carry Over of previous S3557
Note: Carry Over of previous S3557
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-05 - Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires physician to offer to test patient for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency prior to chemotherapy.
Title
Requires physician to offer to test patient for dihydropyrimidine dehydrogenase deficiency prior to chemotherapy.
Sponsors
Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Christopher DePhillips [R] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] |
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-05 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5208 (Carry Over) 2019-03-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S3557 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S3557 (Carry Over) 2019-03-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee