NJ A839 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5066
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities.*
Title
Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S258 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S258 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-20 | Assembly | Approved P.L.2018, c.7. |
2018-04-12 | Assembly | Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-1-0) |
2018-04-05 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (37-0) |
2018-03-26 | Senate | Substituted for S258 (1R) |
2018-03-05 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-22 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee |
2018-02-15 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-1-0) |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5066 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S258 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by A839 (2R)
S258 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by A839 (2R)