NJ S258 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous S3313

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-03-26 - Substituted by A839 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities. *

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities. *

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-26SenateSubstituted by A839 (2R)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee

Same As/Similar To

S3313 (Carry Over) 2017-06-15 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
A839 (Same As) 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.7.

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback