NJ A839 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A5066

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 22-4)
Status: Passed on April 20 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-20 - Approved P.L.2018, c.7.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibits offshore oil and gas exploration, development, and production in State waters, and issuance of DEP permits and approvals for activities associated with offshore oil and gas activities.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-04-12 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur in Senate Amendments (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S258 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-26 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-03-05 - Senate - Senate Environment and Energy Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-20AssemblyApproved P.L.2018, c.7.
2018-04-12AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (72-1-0)
2018-04-05AssemblyReceived in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence
2018-03-26SenatePassed by the Senate (37-0)
2018-03-26SenateSubstituted for S258 (1R)
2018-03-05SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Environment and Energy Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (72-1-0)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5066 (Carry Over) 2017-06-26 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee
S258 (Same As) 2018-03-26 - Substituted by A839 (2R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback