NJ A756 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on March 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-22 - Approved P.L.2017, c.37.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Regulates use of motor vehicle payment assurance devices.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Regulates use of motor vehicle payment assurance devices.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 34 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 67 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute For S2046 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-12-19 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 25 N: 11 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 53 N: 21 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-02-04 - Assembly - Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-22SenateApproved P.L.2017, c.37.
2017-03-13SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (34-2)
2017-02-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2017-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (67-0-0)
2017-02-13Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2017-02-13AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2017-02-13AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2016-12-19SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (25-11)
2016-12-19SenateSubstituted for S2046
2016-09-26SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-04-18SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
2016-04-07AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (53-21-0)
2016-03-14AssemblyAssembly Floor Amendment Passed (Benson)
2016-02-04AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2016-01-27AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Consumer Affairs Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4033 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Moriarty)
S2046 (Same As) 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A756 (1R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback