NJ S2046 | 2016-2017 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4033
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A756 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 21 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-12-19 - Substituted by A756 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Regulates use of motor vehicle payment assurance devices.
Title
Regulates use of motor vehicle payment assurance devices.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-09-26 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-12-19 | Senate | Substituted by A756 (1R) |
2016-09-26 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2016-04-21 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A756 (Same As) 2017-03-22 - Approved P.L.2017, c.37.
A4033 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Moriarty)
A4033 (Carry Over) 2015-06-25 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Moriarty)