NJ A735 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S257
Note: Carry Over of previous A3412
Note: Carry Over of previous S1349
Note: Carry Over of previous A3412
Note: Carry Over of previous S1349
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
Pending: Assembly Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Opioid Prevention and Rehabilitation Program Fund" and tax on opioid drugs.
Title
Establishes "Opioid Prevention and Rehabilitation Program Fund" and tax on opioid drugs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A735 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee
A3412 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S873 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1349 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
A3412 (Carry Over) 2018-02-15 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S873 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S1349 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A735 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1000/735_I1.HTM |