NJ A732 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Approved P.L.2013, c.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Passed on October 16 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-10-16 - Approved P.L.2013, c.168.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes it a crime of the third degree to practice or represent oneself to others concerning certain licensed or certified health care related professions.**
Title
Makes it a crime of the third degree to practice or represent oneself to others concerning certain licensed or certified health care related professions.**
Sponsors
Rep. Timothy Eustace [D] | Sen. Holly Schepisi [R] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Rep. Shavonda Sumter [D] |
Sen. James Beach [D] | Sen. Fred Madden [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-08-19 - Senate - Senate Amend (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2543 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Assembly - Assembly Amend (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-06-27 - Senate - Senate Substitute For S2543 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-21 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-10-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2013, c.168. |
2013-08-19 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (36-0) |
2013-07-29 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Concur by Assembly Amendments (Eustace) (73-0-0) |
2013-06-27 | Assembly | Received in the Assembly, 2nd Reading on Concurrence |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Passed by the Senate (38-0) |
2013-06-27 | Senate | Substituted for S2543 (1R) |
2013-06-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2013-03-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2013-02-14 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Eustace) |
2013-01-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2543 (Same As) 2013-06-27 - Substituted by A732 (3R)