NJ A667 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3950
Note: Carry Over of previous S3180
Note: Carry Over of previous S3180
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Failed on February 3 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-03 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employer use of tracking or electronic communications device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits employer use of tracking or electronic communications device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3950 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.
S3180 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
S3180 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A667 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1000/667_I1.HTM |