NJ S3180 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A667
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 16 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits employer use of tracking or electronic communications device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Title
Prohibits employer use of tracking or electronic communications device in vehicle operated by employee under certain circumstances.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted by A3950 (3R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-01 | Senate | Transferred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee |
2020-11-16 | Senate | Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Labor Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3180 (Carry Over) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A3950 (3R)
A3950 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.
A3950 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.449.