NJ A6148 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-0)
Status: Passed on January 12 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-12 - Approved P.L.2021, c.370.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Appropriates $37,174,636.71 from "New Jersey Library Construction Fund" to provide grants for construction, reconstruction, development, extension, improvement, and furnishing of New Jersey's public libraries.
Title
Appropriates $37,174,636.71 from "New Jersey Library Construction Fund" to provide grants for construction, reconstruction, development, extension, improvement, and furnishing of New Jersey's public libraries.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4221 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4221 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 78 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly State and Local Government Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-12 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.370. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4221 |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-1-2) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S4221 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6148