NJ A6060 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2045
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.476.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.476.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Makes supplemental appropriation of $8 million to DHS to increase reimbursement for funeral, burial, and crematory services provided to certain beneficiaries of Work First New Jersey and Supplemental Security Income programs.
Title
Makes supplemental appropriation of $8 million to DHS to increase reimbursement for funeral, burial, and crematory services provided to certain beneficiaries of Work First New Jersey and Supplemental Security Income programs.
Sponsors
Rep. Cleopatra Tucker [D] | Rep. Ralph Caputo [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] | Sen. Sandra Cunningham [D] |
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4272 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4272 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-06 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 73 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-11-15 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.476. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Substituted for S4272 (1R) |
2022-01-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2022-01-04 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (73-0-0) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-11-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6060 (Carry Over) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.476.
S4272 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6060 (1R)
S4272 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by A6060 (1R)