NJ A5942 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on June 21 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S3999
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Secretary of State and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to share voter and motor vehicle information with state-based non-profit organization for maintaining accuracy of voter registration information.
Title
Authorizes Secretary of State and New Jersey Motor Vehicle Commission to share voter and motor vehicle information with state-based non-profit organization for maintaining accuracy of voter registration information.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-22 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S3999 |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3999 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.139.