NJ A5891 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-3)
Status: Passed on July 8 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.166.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Creates "Office of Strategic Enforcement and Compliance" in DOLWD; appropriates $1 million from General Fund.
Title
Creates "Office of Strategic Enforcement and Compliance" in DOLWD; appropriates $1 million from General Fund.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3921 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3921 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 21 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-08 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.166. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-2) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3921 |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (51-21-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3921 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5891