NJ A5853 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-4)
Status: Passed on September 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-09-16 - Approved P.L.2021, c.218.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires administrator and assistant administrator at State veterans' memorial home have prior work experience in clinical setting.
Title
Requires administrator and assistant administrator at State veterans' memorial home have prior work experience in clinical setting.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3903 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-14 - Assembly - Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-09-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.218. |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3903 (1R) |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-06-14 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Military and Veterans' Affairs Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3903 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5853 (1R)