NJ A5809 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1638
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Passed on January 16 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.343.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amends lists of projects eligible to receive loans for environmental infrastructure projects from NJ Infrastructure Bank for FY 2024.
Title
Amends lists of projects eligible to receive loans for environmental infrastructure projects from NJ Infrastructure Bank for FY 2024.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Yvonne Lopez [D] | Rep. Alex Sauickie [R] | Sen. Andrew Zwicker [D] |
Sen. Parker Space [R] | Rep. Harold Wirths [R] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. Carol Murphy [D] |
Rep. Shanique Speight [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4097 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-01-08 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S4097 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-07 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-12-04 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Senate | Approved P.L.2023, c.343. |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (35-0) |
2024-01-08 | Senate | Substituted for S4097 |
2023-12-11 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2023-12-07 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-1) |
2023-12-04 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2023-11-30 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5809 (Carry Over) 2024-01-16 - Approved P.L.2023, c.343.
S4097 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5809
S4097 (Same As) 2024-01-08 - Substituted by A5809