NJ A5703 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-02 - Approved P.L.2021, c.157.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Requires certain health insurers, Medicaid, NJ FamilyCare, SHBP, and SEHBP to cover opioid antidote without imposing prior authorization requirements.
Title
Requires certain health insurers, Medicaid, NJ FamilyCare, SHBP, and SEHBP to cover opioid antidote without imposing prior authorization requirements.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3800 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3800 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-17 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-02 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.157. |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Substituted for S3800 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3800 (Same As) 2021-06-21 - Substituted by A5703 (1R)