NJ A5610 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-30 - Approved P.L.2019, c.151.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]
Summary
Makes FY 2020 supplemental appropriation of $12.453 million; amends appropriations for Camp Irvington and Turtle Back Zoo; adds language provision appropriating $3.1 million for immigration status-related legal assistance.*
Title
Makes FY 2020 supplemental appropriation of $12.453 million; amends appropriations for Camp Irvington and Turtle Back Zoo; adds language provision appropriating $3.1 million for immigration status-related legal assistance.*
Sponsors
Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] | Sen. Raj Mukherji [D] |
Sen. Loretta Weinberg [D] | Rep. Pamela Lampitt [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3984 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 49 N: 25 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 13 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-17 - Assembly - Assembly Budget Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-30 | Senate | Approved P.L.2019, c.151. |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (22-13) |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3984 |
2019-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (49-25-4) |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-17 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Budget Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3961 (Same As) 2019-06-17 - Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
S3984 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5610 (1R)
S3984 (Same As) 2019-06-20 - Substituted by A5610 (1R)