NJ A5599 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.327.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 18-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.327.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes order of protection for current or former judge; upgrades and clarifies harassment against current or former judge; bars firearms possession by persons against whom current or former judge order of protection is entered.
Title
Establishes order of protection for current or former judge; upgrades and clarifies harassment against current or former judge; bars firearms possession by persons against whom current or former judge order of protection is entered.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3916 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3916 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-30 - Senate - Senate Floor: Enact Emergency Clause (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-21 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-12 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.327. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-2) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Emergency Resolution (38-0) (Scutari) |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Substituted for S3916 |
2021-06-30 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) |
2021-05-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-05-05 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3916 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Substituted by A5599