NJ A5518 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S231
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes "Alternative Fuel Vehicle Transportation Financing Commission" to examine manner in which alternative fuel vehicles may be taxed to contribute to cost of maintaining State transportation system.
Title
Establishes "Alternative Fuel Vehicle Transportation Financing Commission" to examine manner in which alternative fuel vehicles may be taxed to contribute to cost of maintaining State transportation system.
Sponsors
Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Robert Karabinchak [D] | Rep. Nancy Pinkin [D] | Rep. James Kennedy [D] |
Rep. Nicholas Chiaravalloti [D] | Rep. Herbert Conaway [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 68 N: 7 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-12 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-09 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (68-7-1) |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-12-12 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-12-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-06 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5518 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S4090 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S4090 (Same As) 2019-11-14 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading