NJ A5385 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Substituted by S3456
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.
Title
Eliminates mandatory minimum terms of imprisonment determined by Legislature to be of non-violent nature.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | Assembly | Substituted by S3456 |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2021-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3456 (Same As) 2021-04-19 - Conditional Veto, Received in the Senate