NJ A5353 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.326.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 17-1)
Status: Passed on December 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.326.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides for certification of temporary nurse aides.
Title
Provides for certification of temporary nurse aides.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-12-20 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3421 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-03 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3421 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-08 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-21 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.326. |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2021-11-08 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0) |
2021-06-03 | Senate | Substituted for S3421 (1R) |
2021-05-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-04-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-03-25 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (72-0-0) |
2021-03-08 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-02-22 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3421 (Same As) 2021-06-03 - Substituted by A5353 (1R)