NJ A5336 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.468.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-2)
Status: Passed on January 18 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.468.
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DHS to establish payment programs for purchase of transportation services from private sector and government transportation service providers.
Title
Requires DHS to establish payment programs for purchase of transportation services from private sector and government transportation service providers.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-01-10 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3441 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 78 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-20 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S3441 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-16 - Senate - Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-12-06 - Senate - Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-18 | Senate | Approved P.L.2021, c.468. |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2022-01-10 | Senate | Received in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (78-0-0) |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | 2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend. |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | First Reading/Governor Recommendations Only |
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Conditional Veto, Received in the Assembly |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0) |
2021-12-20 | Senate | Substituted for S3441 (1R) |
2021-12-16 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-09 | Senate | Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee |
2021-12-06 | Senate | Reported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-28 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee |
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-01-27 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S3441 (Same As) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by A5336 (1R)