NJ A5238 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A3392
Note: Carry Foward to future S1219
Note: Carry Foward to future S1219
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 16 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires student representative be appointed to each board of education of school district and board of trustees of charter school that includes grades nine through 12.*
Title
Requires student representative be appointed to each board of education of school district and board of trustees of charter school that includes grades nine through 12.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-12-16 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 74 N: 1 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-11-18 - Assembly - Assembly Education Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-06 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2019-12-16 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (74-1-0) |
2019-11-25 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2019-11-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5238 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5238 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S4176 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A5238 (Carry Over) 2020-01-06 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
S4176 (Same As) 2019-11-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee