NJ A5234 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A610

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Introduced on May 13 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-07 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Permits counties to establish a central municipal drug court.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Permits counties to establish a central municipal drug court.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-11-07 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-07AssemblyReported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-11-07AssemblyTransferred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
2019-05-13AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Same As/Similar To

S2214 (Same As) 2018-03-08 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A610 (Carry Over) 2016-01-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback