NJ A5228 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1297
Note: Carry Foward to future A3518
Note: Carry Over of previous S3566
Note: Carry Over of previous A5433
Note: Carry Foward to future A3518
Note: Carry Over of previous S3566
Note: Carry Over of previous A5433
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires MVC to create mobile driver's licenses and identification cards.
Title
Requires MVC to create mobile driver's licenses and identification cards.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-23 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5228 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5228 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S773 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3566 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5433 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A5228 (Carry Over) 2023-02-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S773 (Same As) 2022-03-07 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S3566 (Carry Over) 2021-06-10 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5433 (Carry Over) 2021-03-08 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A5228 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A5500/5228_I1.HTM |