NJ A5161 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2614
Note: Carry Foward to future S2723
Note: Carry Foward to future S2723
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 11 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act."
Title
"21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-05-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-03-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5161 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
A5161 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3619 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
A5161 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S3619 (Same As) 2019-03-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee