NJ A2614 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A477
Note: Carry Over of previous A5161
Note: Carry Over of previous A5161
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S2723 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S2723 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act."
Title
"21st Century Integrated Digital Experience Act."
Sponsors
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Sen. Britnee Timberlake [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-02-24 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-10-21 - Assembly - Assembly Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-10 | Assembly | Substituted by S2723 (2R) |
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-02-24 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2020-10-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Science, Innovation and Technology Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2614 (Carry Over) 2022-01-10 - Substituted by S2723 (2R)
A5161 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2723 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.392.
S3994 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.314.
A5161 (Carry Over) 2019-06-13 - Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
S2723 (Same As) 2022-01-18 - Approved P.L.2021, c.392.
S3994 (Same As) 2021-12-21 - Approved P.L.2021, c.314.