NJ A5095 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A2213
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3270 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3270 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Prohibits insurers from offering stop loss insurance to small employers.
Title
Prohibits insurers from offering stop loss insurance to small employers.
Sponsors
Sen. John McKeon [D] | Rep. Roy Freiman [D] | Rep. BettyLou DeCroce [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-01-09 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S3270 (3R) |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2020-01-09 | Assembly | Recommitted to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2019-06-18 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-02-25 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5095 (Carry Over) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3270 (3R)
S3270 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
S3270 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session