NJ S3270 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Enrolled on January 13 2020 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-17-3)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]

Summary

Establishes certain requirements for stop loss insurance offered to small employers.*

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Establishes certain requirements for stop loss insurance offered to small employers.*

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-01-13 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 22 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Substitute for A5095 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-01-13 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 51 N: 17 NV: 12 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Second Reading (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-12-16 - Senate - Senate Floor: Amend (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 14 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Commerce Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 3 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-13AssemblyPassed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (51-17-3)
2020-01-13AssemblySubstituted for A5095 (1R)
2020-01-13AssemblyReceived in the Assembly without Reference, 2nd Reading
2020-01-13SenatePassed by the Senate (22-14)
2020-01-09SenateSenate Amendment (21-1) (Pou)
2019-12-16SenateSenate Amendment (26-0) (Pou)
2019-03-04SenateReported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
2019-02-14SenateIntroduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee

Same As/Similar To

A5095 (Same As) 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S3270 (3R)

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback